IL SB2076 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, but with the following changes. Removes provisions relating to, among other things, the following: desertion; offenses against correctional custody and restriction; spies; espionage; public records; forgery; mail; leaving the scene of a vehicle accident; drunken or reckless operation of a vehicle, aircraft, or vessel; endangerment; murder; manslaughter; death or injury of an unborn child; child endangerment; rape and sexual assault of adults and children; other sexual misconduct; larceny; fraudulent use of credit cards and debit cards; robbery; receiving stolen property; directing payment of money without sufficient funds; frauds against the United States; bribery; graft; kidnapping; arson; extortion; assault; maiming; burglary; stalking; perjury; subornation of perjury; obstructing justice; misprision; wrongful refusal to testify; and prevention of authorized seizure of property. Provides that certain regulations shall be prescribed by the Secretary of the Army or the Air Force. Removes punishment by death for committing specified offenses and instead provides that the punishment shall be as a court-martial may direct. Effective immediately.
Title
MILITARY JUSTICE-UNIFORM CODE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0367 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-23 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-25 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |