IL SB2096 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the textbook block grant program, removes a provision requiring the State Board of Education to preapprove and designate textbooks authorized to be purchased under the program; makes a related change. With regard to special education classes for children from orphanages, foster family homes, children's homes, or State residential units, removes a provision requiring each school district claiming reimbursement for a program operated as a group program to have an approved budget on file with the State Board prior to the initiation of the program's operation; makes a related change and other changes regarding claims and reimbursements. With regard to the evidence-based funding formula, removes a provision requiring the State Superintendent of Education to certify the actual amounts of the New State Funds payable for each eligible Organizational Unit based on the equitable distribution calculation to the unit's treasurer and publish a yearly distribution schedule at its meeting in June. Provides that no publisher or retail dealer (rather than person) shall offer any school instructional materials for adoption, sale, or exchange in this State until it has complied with certain conditions; makes related changes. Makes other changes with regard to instructional materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL CODE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0017
2019-06-14SenateEffective Date June 14, 2019
2019-06-14SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-10SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 041-017-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-017-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 009-004-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 009-004-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-004-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-05-21HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-21HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-05-20HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-20HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Education; 015-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-7.03Amended CodeCitation Text
105518-3Amended CodeCitation Text
105518-8.15Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.155Amended CodeCitation Text
105528-1Amended CodeCitation Text
105528-21Amended CodeCitation Text
105528-4Amended CodeCitation Text
105528-7Amended CodeCitation Text
105528-8Amended CodeCitation Text
105528-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2096&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2096.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2096eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2096enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0017.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2096ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2096ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2096ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2096_04042019_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB2096_05282019_037000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2096ham003_05302019_048001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2096ham001_05302019_048000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback