IL SB2133 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Defines "zero-based budgeting" as a method of setting budgets that requires a justification of all expenditures, not only those that exceed the prior year's allocations. Thus, each budget line begins at a zero base and must be funded according to merit rather than according to the level approved for the preceding year, when circumstances were probably different. For fiscal year 2010, Provides that the budgets submitted by the Governor and appropriations made by the General Assembly for the following agencies must adhere to the principles of zero-based budgeting: the Department of Labor, the Historic Preservation Agency, the Department of Human Rights, the Department of Agriculture, and the Environmental Protection Agency. For fiscal year 2011 and thereafter, provides that the budgets submitted by the Governor and appropriations made by the General Assembly for all agencies under the jurisdiction of the Executive Ethics Commission must adhere to the principles of zero-based budgeting. Effective immediately.
Title
ZERO-BASED BUDGETING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Held in Appropriations I | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2133&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2133.htm |