IL SB2222 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Board of Education Article of the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2023-2024 school year, all internships for school social workers must be paid internships. Provides that subject to appropriation, the State Board of Education shall award competitive grants on an annual basis to school districts to assist in the funding of these paid internships. Provides that the State Board of Education shall annually disseminate a request for applications to the grant program. Provides that higher priority shall be given to schools that demonstrate a shortage of school social workers, which is determined by the average ratio of school social workers to students in the target school district over the preceding 3 school years. Provides that the State Board of Education shall produce an annual report on the program. Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that subject to appropriation, the Board of Higher Education, shall award competitive grants on an annual basis to colleges or universities in the State to fund field placements for social workers. Provides that Subject to appropriation, colleges and universities shall annually disseminate a request for applications to the grant program. Provides that colleges and universities, upon receiving funding, shall provide applications to students eligible for this funding. Provides that the college or university shall give priority to applicants who are a member of a racial minority. Provides that each college or university that receives funds shall provide an annual report to the State Board of Higher Education, and the Board of Higher Education shall publish those reports on the State Board's website. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUC-SCH SOCIAL WORKER GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.196 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 205 | 9.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |