IL SB2296 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. In a provision permitting the Department of Children and Family Services to refer any child or family to services available from other agencies in the community if the conditions in the child's or family's home are reasonably likely to subject the child or family to future reports of suspected child abuse or neglect, provides that if the family chooses to receive family preservation services and there are children under the age of 6 living in the household, those children shall be enrolled in appropriate early childhood education services. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-FAMILY PRESERVATION
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |