IL SB2330 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Data Transparency and Privacy Act. Provides that any business that processes personal information or deidentified information must, prior to processing, provide notice to the consumer to whom the information refers or belongs of specific information in the service agreement or somewhere readily accessible on the business' website or mobile application. Establishes a "right to know" for consumers and prescribes types of information that they may request of businesses. Provides that consumers have the right to opt out of agreements that entail the disclosure of personal information from the business to third parties and affiliates, the sale of personal information from the business to third parties and affiliates, and the processing of personal information by the business, third parties, and affiliates. Provides that consumers have the right to request that a business correct inaccurate personal information about the consumer or delete personal information about the consumer. Prescribes a protocol for the handling of consumer requests by businesses. Prescribes pricing incentives and prohibitions against discrimination. Provides that businesses, affiliates, and third parties must conduct risk assessments and provides requirements for the assessments. Provides that enforcement of the Act may arise through private actions or enforcement by the Attorney General. Provides that any waiver of the provisions of the Act is void and unenforceable. Contains home rule preemption and severability provisions. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DATA TRANSPARENCY PRIVACY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020
2020-04-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020
2020-03-18SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading
2020-01-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback