IL SB2530 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that any emergency services personnel, public safety personnel, or individuals licensed as emergency medical services personnel under the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act who have been diagnosed by a licensed psychiatrist with post-traumatic stress disorder are entitled to benefits under the Act. Provides that a qualifying individual is not required to demonstrate physical injury to receive benefits under the Act. Requires the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission to ensure that services provided under the amendatory Act comply with all applicable federal parity regulations including, but not limited to, the Paul Wellstone and Pete Domenici Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008. Requires emergency services providers and law enforcement agencies to provide employees with educational training related to mental health awareness, prevention, mitigation, and treatment.
Title
WORKER COMP-PTSD-EMS-POLICE
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2530&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2530.htm |