IL SB2697 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Insurance Committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Insurance Committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill, as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1, with the following changes. Removes language concerning coverage for any cancer risk management strategy, as recommended by a health care professional. Requires, for individuals with a genetic test that is positive for an inherited mutation associated with an increased risk of cancer, coverage to include any evidence-based screenings, as recommended by a health care professional in accordance with current evidence-based clinical practice guidelines, to the extent that the management recommendation is not already covered by the policy, except that the coverage for the evidence-based screenings may be subject to a deductible, coinsurance, or other cost-sharing limitation. Defines "evidence-based screenings". Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Subject to federal approval, requires the medical assistance program to provide coverage for clinical genetic testing for an inherited gene mutation for individuals with a personal or family history of cancer, as recommended by a health care professional in accordance with current evidence-based clinical practice guidelines. Requires, for individuals with a genetic test that is positive for an inherited mutation associated with an increased risk of cancer, coverage to include any evidence-based screenings, as recommended by a health care professional in accordance with current evidence-based clinical practice guidelines, to the extent that the management recommendation is not already covered by the medical assistance program. Changes to the Illinois Public Aid Code are effective January 1, 2025.
Title
INS CD-CANCER-GENETIC TESTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |