IL SB2765 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Provides that specified provisions under the Act do not limit the personal liability of a member or manager imposed under law other than the Act, including, but not limited to, the law of agency, contracts, and torts, and, subject to specified provisions, court imposed equitable remedies, such as piercing the limited liability company veil. Provides that the provisions apply to all actions with respect to which all timely appeals have not been exhausted before the effective date of the amendatory Act and all future actions commenced on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Makes other changes.
Title
LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-002 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |