IL SB2803 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Restorative Justice
Pending: House Restorative Justice Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Restorative Justice
Pending: House Restorative Justice Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Sets forth procedures for the Secretary of State to issue a standard Illinois Identification Card to a person committed to the Department of Corrections, the Department of Juvenile Justice, a Federal Bureau of Prisons facility located in Illinois, or a county jail or county department of corrections (rather than the Department of Corrections or Department of Juvenile Justice). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
IL ID CARD-FEDERAL PRISONERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-018-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |