IL SB2874 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district may (instead of shall) make menstrual hygiene products available, at no cost to students, in bathrooms of every school building that are open for student use in grades 4 through 12 during the regular school day. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH-MENSTRUAL HYGIENE PRODUCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2874&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2874.htm |