IL SB3091 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Natural Resources to convey the described parcel in Will County to the Forest Preserve District of Will County. Effective immediately.
Title
IDNR-LAND TRANSFER-WILL CO
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] |
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |