IL SB3098 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Property Control Act. Provides for the transfer of the remaining balance from the State Police Vehicle Maintenance Fund into the State Police Vehicle Fund. Dissolves the State Police Vehicle Maintenance Fund. Provides that any future deposits due to and any outstanding obligations or liabilities of the State Police Vehicle Maintenance Fund shall pass to the State Police Vehicle Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Repeals the State Police Vehicle Maintenance Fund on January 1, 2022. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE POLICE-FUND TRANSFER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 605 | 7b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 605 | 7c | Amended Code | Citation Text |