IL SB3362 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:30 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:30 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that a retailer that makes retail sales of tangible personal property to Illinois customers from a location or locations outside of Illinois is engaged in the occupation of selling at retail in Illinois for the purposes of the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act under specified conditions. Provides that a retailer maintaining a place of business in this State that makes retail sales of tangible personal property to Illinois customers from a location or locations outside of Illinois is engaged in the business of selling at the Illinois location to which the tangible personal property is shipped or delivered or at which possession is taken by the purchaser. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
ROTA-RETAILERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-013-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |