IL SB3460 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in 118 and Virtual Room 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in 118 and Virtual Room 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Self-Service Storage Facility Act. Provides that a rental agreement may be delivered and accepted by electronic mail. Provides that if the occupant does not sign a written rental agreement that the owner has tendered to the occupant, the occupant's continued use of the storage space shall constitute an acceptance of the rental agreement with the same effect as if it had been signed by the occupant. Defines "default" as the failure to perform any obligation or duty set forth in the rental agreement or the Act. Includes a trailer in the types of property for which specified towing remedies are available. Provides that an occupant may not use a self-service storage facility after the owner has delivered a written notice of termination or non-renewal of the occupant's rental agreement. Provides that notice must be in person, by verified mail, or by electronic mail. Allows the owner to place reasonable restrictions on the occupant's use of the self-service storage facility before removal of personal property, including denying access to the self-service storage facility, except for the occupant to remove personal property during the owner's normal business hours. Provides that the owner may dispose of any personal property remaining at the self-service storage facility after the date provided in the written notice.
Title
SELF-SERVICE STORAGE-DEFAULT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 95 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 95 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |