IL SB3501 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
Pending: House Energy & Environment Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in 114 and Virtual Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
Pending: House Energy & Environment Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in 114 and Virtual Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Responsible Outdoor Lighting Control Act. Includes legislative findings. Defines terms. Provides that all new, renovated, or retrofitted luminaires purchased with State funds after the effective date of the Act or installed after the effective date of the Act on a structure or land that is owned, supported, funded, leased, or managed by the State must follow specified outdoor lighting control requirements. Includes various exceptions to compliance. Allows the Attorney General, a municipality, or a county to enforce the Act by filing an action for injunctive relief in a circuit court. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall make available a resource guide for the public to add lighting to homes and businesses consistent with the requirements for luminaires on a structure or land that is owned, supported, funded, leased, or managed by the State under the Act, and provides that the guide must include references to publicly accessible websites of advocacy groups approved by the State that provide education, guidance, and specifications relating to the implementation of responsible lighting principles. Provides that, if the Act conflicts with any other federal law, State law, or local ordinance controlling lighting, outdoor luminaries, signage, outdoor advertising, displays, or devices that is more stringent than the Act, then the federal law, State law, or local ordinance controls to the extent it is more stringent than the Act. Effective 60 days after becoming law.
Title
OUTDOOR LIGHTING CONTROL ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-001-000 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in State Government |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this committee amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |