IL SB3530 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
Pending: Senate Appropriations Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
Pending: Senate Appropriations Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $8,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to State Board of Education for a grant to YouthBuild Illinois. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$ST BD ED-YOUTHBUILD ILLINOIS
Sponsors
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3530&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB3530.pdf |