IL SB3581 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that the governing board of each public university shall report to the Board of Higher Education by the 11th day after the start of the academic year specified student enrollment data. Provides that the Board of Higher Education shall post the student enrollment data on its Internet website. Provides that the governing board of each community college district shall report to the Illinois Community College Board by the 11th day after the start of the academic year specified student enrollment data. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board shall post the student enrollment data on its Internet website.
Title
HIGHER ED-REPORT ENROLL DATA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 180 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 155 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-265 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-270 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-265 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-275 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-270 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-275 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |