IL SB3762 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
Pending: House Immigration & Human Rights Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
Pending: House Immigration & Human Rights Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Language Equity and Access Act. Requires the Governor's Office of New Americans, in partnership with the Department of Human Services, to: prepare a Language Needs Assessment Report that identifies the languages spoken throughout the State; assist State agencies in the creation of language access plans; provide oversight and central coordination to State agencies in the implementation of language access requirements under this Act; ensure that each State agency develops an internal complaint and review process specific to the provision of language assistance services in addressing complaints in a timely manner; and perform other duties. Requires the Office and Department to work with State agencies to compile available United States Census data on language used across the State to inform the Language Needs Assessment Report. Provides that the report shall be updated every 10 years in conjunction with the decennial federal census. Requires each State agency to prepare and submit a language access plan to the Governor's Office of New Americans.
Title
LANGUAGE EQUITY AND ACCESS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-008-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |