IL SJR0026 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinds Illinois' ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
RESCIND-CORWIN AMENDMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Plummer |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |