IL SR0208 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the fourth week of April 2019 as "Illinois Distracted Driving Awareness Week".
Title
DISTRACTED DRIVING WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=208&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0208.htm |