IL SR0401 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 15, 2019 as "Stop the Bleed Day" and encourages all citizens to participate in the initiative and learn more about the importance of bleeding control measures.
Title
STOP THE BLEED DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=401&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0401.htm |