IN HB1043 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Representative Dvorak added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Representative Dvorak added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical malpractice caps. Increases the medical malpractice cap from $1,250,000 to $1,650,000 for claims arising after June 30, 2015. Provides that payments from the patient's compensation fund are to be disbursed not later than 60 days after the issuance of a final, nonappealable judgment. Increases pay for medical review panel members from $350 to $500. Increases potential pay for the medical review panel chairperson from $2,000 to $2,500. Increases the maximum potential liability of a qualified health care provider for an occurrence of malpractice from $250,000 to: (1) $300,000; or (2) $400,000 if the action against the health care provider
Title
Medical malpractice caps. Increases the medical malpractice cap from $1,250,000 to $1,650,000 for claims arising after June 30, 2015. Provides that payments from the patient's compensation fund are to be disbursed not later than 60 days after the issuance of a final, nonappealable judgment. Increases pay for medical review panel members from $350 to $500. Increases potential pay for the medical review panel chairperson from $2,000 to $2,500. Increases the maximum potential liability of a qualified health care provider for an occurrence of malpractice from $250,000 to: (1) $300,000; or (2) $400,000 if the action against the health care provider
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Torr |