IN HB1050 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a special circumstances hunting safety card.
Title
Special circumstances hunting safety card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 105002 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 105001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 105002 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 105001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | Public Law 204 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 388: yeas 90 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 219: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 213: yeas 90 and nays 5 |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Yoder added as first sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Eberhart added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Kersey added as coauthor. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Arnold L. |