IN HB1061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Representative Jackson added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Representative Jackson added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Subdividing land. Allows a property owner to subdivide a parcel by deed, if the parcel is being subdivided to build or expand a residential structure or home, the use is a permitted use, the deed is recorded, a plat drawing is submitted to the political subdivision, and the lot is served by a permitted septic system, sewer system, or package plant for sewage treatment. Provides that the subdivision of a parcel is not subject to any requirements or approvals of the political subdivision with regard to zoning the property with certain exceptions.
Title
Subdividing land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Representative Jackson added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2020-01-09 | House | Representative Miller added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ellington |