IN HB1111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tactical emergency medicine.
Title
Tactical emergency medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 64 |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau, Grooms and Leising added as cosponsors |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-28 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker and Arnold |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-01-24 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment 1 (McNamara), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2013-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Riecken and Bacon |
2013-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |