IN HB1384 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Representative Neese added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Representative Neese added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the water pollution control board to adopt rules establishing testing requirements and procedures for backflow prevention devices contained in a customer service line. Requires continuing professional education for an Indiana registered cross-connection control inspector. Requires continuing professional education for journeyman plumbers. Establishes the cross-connection control inspector continuing education fund. Provides that the fund may be used to: (1) administer the cross-connection control inspector continuing education program; (2) provide registration cards to an Indiana registered cross-connection control inspector; and (3) maintain and update an Indiana registered cross-connection control inspector database. Provides that the water pollution control board may establish registration fees in an amount not to exceed: (1) $50 for a new cross-connection control inspector; and (2) $30 for a renewal cross-connection control inspector. Provides that the amount may not be more than is reasonably necessary to generate revenue sufficient to offset the costs incurred by the Indiana department of environmental management. Requires the water pollution control board to establish rules to require a cross-connection control inspector to indicate as to whether a commercial or residential, excluding agricultural, water distribution system contains moisture sensing technology by providing verification on the cross-connection control inspector's inspection report. Allows a plumber to renew a journeyman plumber's license by verifying compliance with professional education requirements on the license renewal application or by providing course documentation.
Title
Plumbing matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Representative Neese added as coauthor | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Representative Wolkins added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Representative Stemler added as coauthor | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Niezgodski |