IN HB1414 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electric generation. Provides that a public utility that owns and operates a reliable capacity electric generation resource shall operate and maintain the unit using good utility practices and in a manner reasonably intended to support the availability of the unit for dispatch and for providing reliable service to customers of the public utility. Prohibits a public utility from terminating a power agreement with a legacy generation resource in which the public utility has an ownership interest unless the public utility provides the utility regulatory commission (IURC) with at least three years advance notice of the termination. Provides that the IURC shall determine the reasonable costs incurred by the public utility under the power agreement and allow the public utility to recover those costs in a fuel adjustment charge proceeding. Provides that a public utility may not retire, sell, or transfer a reliable capacity resource with a capacity of at least 80 megawatts before May 1, 2021, unless: (1) the public utility first provides written notice to the IURC of the public utility's intent to do so; and (2) the IURC conducts a public hearing to receive information concerning the reasonableness of the planned retirement, sale, or transfer. Requires the IURC to conduct the required hearing and issue its analysis and conclusions concerning the reasonableness of the planned retirement, sale, or transfer not later than 120 days after the date of the IURC's receipt of the public utility's written notice to the IURC. Provides that if the planned retirement, sale, or transfer: (1) was included in the public utility's preferred portfolio in the public utility's most recent integrated resource plan, the public utility may proceed with the planned retirement, sale, or transfer after the commission issues the commission's analysis and conclusions; or (2) was not included in the public utility's preferred portfolio in the public utility's most recent integrated resource plan, the public utility may not proceed with the planned retirement, sale, or transfer until at least six months have elapsed from the date of the commission's receipt of the public utility's written notice of the planned retirement, sale, or transfer. Provides that if a public utility cites a federal mandate as the basis, in whole or in part, for the planned retirement, sale, or transfer of the reliable capacity resource, the IURC may consider as part of its analysis and conclusions whether the cited federal mandate: (1) is in force; (2) has not expired or been revoked; and (3) is not merely anticipated to be enacted; at the time of the public utility's notice. Provides that these provisions expire May 1, 2021. Provides that in awarding high value workforce ready credit-bearing grants, the commission for higher education, in conjunction with the department of workforce development, shall give priority to an applicant who is a coal transition worker. Defines a "coal transition worker" as an individual who is laid off or terminated from the individual's employment: (1) at a commercial coal mine in Indiana; (2) at a coal fired electric generating unit in Indiana; or (3) in an Indiana based manufacturing or transportation supply chain serving: (A) a commercial coal mine; or (B) a coal fired electric generating unit; in Indiana.
Title
Electric generation.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] |
Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Morrison) prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #7 (Dvorak) failed (Y: 11 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Morrison) prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #7 (Dvorak) failed (Y: 11 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 165 |
2020-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 361: yeas 28, nays 21 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 355: yeas 56, nays 37 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Morrison added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Pierce removed as conferee |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Morrison removed as advisor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Koch added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Koch removed as advisor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon, Stoops, Koch and Niezgodski |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Hostettler, Morrison, Manning, Hatfield and Macer |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Pierce |
2020-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 267: yeas 10, nays 38 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Garten |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Koch, Houchin |
2020-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 52, nays 41 |
2020-01-30 | House | Amendment #6 (Morrison) prevailed; Roll Call 143: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) ruled out of order |
2020-01-30 | House | Amendment #7 (Dvorak) failed; Roll Call 142: yeas 11, nays 83 |
2020-01-30 | House | Amendment #8 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Manning added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Representatives Morrison and Hostettler added as coauthors |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2020-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |