IN HB1509 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study committee on obsolete statutes. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of reducing the size of the Indiana Code by identifying for repeal statutes that are: (1) obsolete; (2) superseded; (3) no longer applied; or (4) unnecessarily burdensome to the residents of Indiana when the burdens of compliance are compared to the governmental interests served by the statute.
Title
Study committee on obsolete statutes. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of reducing the size of the Indiana Code by identifying for repeal statutes that are: (1) obsolete; (2) superseded; (3) no longer applied; or (4) unnecessarily burdensome to the residents of Indiana when the burdens of compliance are compared to the governmental interests served by the statute.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 158 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 405: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Hershman added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Smith, M. added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Reassigned to committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative VanNatter |