IN HB1648 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sentence modification. Establishes an additional sentencing modification procedure for certain individuals and requires that the department of correction annually review inmate records and transmit certain information to specified persons.
Title
Sentence modification.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Beau Baird [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 89, nays 1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Taylor G |
2023-02-20 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Morris |
2023-01-19 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Baird |