IN SB0001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a person may use reasonable force against any other person in certain circumstances. Provides that a person is justified in using reasonable force against a public servant if the person reasonably believes the force is necessary to: (1) protect the person or a third person from unlawful force; (2) prevent or terminate the public servant's unlawful entry into the person's dwelling; or (3) prevent or terminate the public servant's criminal interference with property lawfully in the person's possession. Specifies that a person is not justified in using force against a public servant if: (1) the person is committing or is escaping after the commission of a crime; (2) the person provokes action by the public servant with intent to injure the public servant; (3) the person has entered into combat with the public servant or is the initial aggressor; or (4) the person reasonably believes the public servant is acting lawfully or is engaged in the lawful execution of the public servant's official duties. Provides that a person is not justified in using deadly force against a public servant whom the person knows or reasonably should know is a public servant unless: (1) the person reasonably believes that the public servant is acting unlawfully or is not engaged in the execution of the public servant's official duties; and (2) the force is reasonably necessary to prevent serious bodily injury to the person or a third person.
Title
Self defense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 414: yeas 67, nays 26 | |
2012-03-09 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 359: yeas 38, nays 12 | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Steuerwald added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Steuerwald removed as House advisor | |
2012-03-09 | Representative L. Lawson removed as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Delph added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Delph removed as advisor | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Taylor removed as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Taylor added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Lanane removed as coauthor | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Lanane removed as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senate advisors appointed: Delph, Hume and Steele | |
2012-03-09 | Senate conferees appointed: M. Young and Lanane | |
2012-03-08 | Senator Becker removed as coauthor | |
2012-03-07 | Senator Wyss removed as coauthor | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Torr and Dvorak | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: McMillin and L. Lawson | |
2012-03-05 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-03-01 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 74, nays 24 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 1 (DeLaney), withdrawn | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 2 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2012-01-23 | Senators Zakas and Bray added as coauthors | |
2012-01-23 | Representative Speedy added as cosponsor | |
2012-01-23 | Cosponsor: Rep. Turner | |
2012-01-23 | House sponsor: Rep. McMillin | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 45 and nays 5 | |
2012-01-19 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-17 | Senators Lanane, Hume and Rogers added as coauthors | |
2012-01-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-05 | Senators Alting, Banks, Becker, Boots, Buck, Delph, Eckerty, Gard, Glick, Grooms, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Kruse, Landske, Lawson, Leising, Long, Merritt, Miller, Mishler, Nugent, Paul, Schneider, Simpson, Smith, Tomes, Walker, Waltz, Waterman, Wyss and Yoder added as coauthors | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators M. Young, Charbonneau and Steele |