IN SB0019 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
License suspension. Allows the BMV to add an additional compliance period for those seeking material error review regarding certain license suspensions.
Title
License suspension.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dernulc [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. David Vinzant [D] |
Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] | Rep. Timothy O'Brien [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Public Law 72 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2024-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 87, nays 4 |
2024-02-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-15 | House | Representatives Hamilton and O'Brien added as cosponsors |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Slager |
2024-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Olthoff |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Vinzant added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second author |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dernulc |
Subjects
AGENCIES; Bureau of Motor Vehicles (BMV)
INSURANCE; Motor Vehicles
TRANSPORTATION; Licenses, Plates, Registration, and Titles
INSURANCE; Motor Vehicles
TRANSPORTATION; Licenses, Plates, Registration, and Titles