IN SB0055 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 156: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 156: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical malpractice actions. Permits a patient to bring an action against a health care provider without submitting the complaint to the medical review board if: (1) the amount of the claim is not more than $15,000; (2) the cause of action is based on the removal of the wrong body part; or (3) the cause of action is based on the existence of a foreign object in the patient's body.
Title
Medical malpractice actions. Permits a patient to bring an action against a health care provider without submitting the complaint to the medical review board if: (1) the amount of the claim is not more than $15,000; (2) the cause of action is based on the removal of the wrong body part; or (3) the cause of action is based on the existence of a foreign object in the patient's body.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #10 (Steele) prevailed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #10 (Steele) prevailed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 156: yeas 22, nays 27 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Steele) prevailed; Roll Call 145: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second author |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele |