IN SB0071 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adverse possession statute of limitations. Amends the statute concerning the statute of limitations for actions for the recovery of the possession of real estate to provide that such an action that: (1) involves a line located and established by a professional surveyor; and (2) accrues before the lines are located and established by the surveyor; must be commenced before the expiration of the appeal period set forth in the statute governing county surveyors. Amends the Indiana Code provision concerning the establishment of property lines by means of a legal survey to specify that the lines established are binding on all affected landowners, including a landowner who claims title under a claim of adverse possession. Provides that certain information must be contained in a notice of survey sent to adjoining landowners, and that a legible copy of the plat of the legal survey must be enclosed with the notice.
Title
Adverse possession statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Rep. Ethan Manning [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Manning and Miller |
2020-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Koch added as third author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |