IN SB0099 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study committee on invasive species. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee (committee) the topic of studying issues related to invasive species. Specifies that the committee must consider the following: (1) An examination of the Indiana Invasives Initiative, including: (A) funding sources available to the Indiana Invasives Initiative; and (B) the potential for making the Indiana Invasives Initiative an agency of state government. (2) Funding sources available to the invasive species council.
Title
Study committee on invasive species.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Rep. David Abbott [R] |
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Abbott |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |