IN SB0206 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental matters. Authorizes the department of environmental management (department) to use electronic means to deliver mail communications, send or publish notices, accept notices and permit applications, provide access to documents for public comment, and store documents for future access. Authorizes the use of electronic communications in proceedings involving regional water, sewage, and solid waste districts. Requires the IDEM to make a determination concerning prior approval for the construction or expansion of a biomass anaerobic digestion facility or biomass gasification facility not more than 90 days after the date on which the department receives the completed application. Eliminates a provision of law stating that a person constructing or expanding a biomass anaerobic digestion facility or a biomass gasification facility is not required to obtain the prior approval of the department if air pollution control permit requirements apply to the facility.
Title
Environmental matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 27 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Morrison |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senator Dernulc added as second author |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |