IN SB0223 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Representatives Clere and Smith, V. added as cosponsors
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Representatives Clere and Smith, V. added as cosponsors
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) requirements. Requires all students, except for students at certain nonpublic schools, in their senior year to complete and submit the FAFSA unless: (1) a parent of a student or a student, if the student is an emancipated minor, signs a waiver that the student understands what the FAFSA is and declines to complete it; or (2) the principal of the student's high school waives the requirement due to extenuating circumstances. Requires that the: (1) model notice prepared by the commission for higher education; and (2) notice that each school corporation is required to send; regarding the FAFSA include information regarding the requirements and exceptions for completing the FAFSA.
Title
Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] |
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Representatives Clere and Smith, V. added as cosponsors |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 38, nays 12 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |