IN SB0262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Housing tax credits. Provides an affordable and workforce housing state tax credit against state tax liability to a taxpayer for each taxable year in the state tax credit period of a qualified project in an aggregate amount that does not exceed the product of a percentage between 40% and 100% and the amount of the taxpayer's aggregate federal tax credit for the qualified project. Provides that an eligible applicant must apply to the Indiana housing and community development authority for an award of an affordable and workforce housing state tax credit. Provides that a holder of an affordable and workforce housing state tax credit may transfer, sell, or assign all or part of the holder's right to claim the state tax credit for a taxable year.
Title
Housing tax credits.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Dave Heine [R] |
Rep. Mike Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Heine |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senators Busch, Lanane, Qaddoura added as coauthors |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |