IN SB0381 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Senator Grooms added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Senator Grooms added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Visually impaired preschool services. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services to contract with an entity to provide vision assessments and early intervention services to infants and toddlers with disabilities who are in need of vision services. Makes an annual appropriation.
Title
Visually impaired preschool services. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services to contract with an entity to provide vision assessments and early intervention services to infants and toddlers with disabilities who are in need of vision services. Makes an annual appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as second author |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b) reassigned to committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stoops |