IN SB0439 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bias crimes. Makes it an aggravating circumstance (for purposes of imposing a criminal sentence) that the crime was committed with the intent to harm or intimidate an individual because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the individual.
Title
Bias crimes. Makes it an aggravating circumstance (for purposes of imposing a criminal sentence) that the crime was committed with the intent to harm or intimidate an individual because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the individual.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |