IN SB0485 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Senator Breaux added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Senator Breaux added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Psychiatric crisis intervention. Changes the date by which the office of the secretary of family and social services must provide a report concerning comprehensive psychiatric crisis intervention services. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to establish a psychiatric crisis intervention pilot program. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Psychiatric crisis intervention. Changes the date by which the office of the secretary of family and social services must provide a report concerning comprehensive psychiatric crisis intervention services. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to establish a psychiatric crisis intervention pilot program. Makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |