IN SB0506 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fleet vehicle registration. Establishes the fleet registration program (program) for Indiana residents who own or lease at least 1,000 passenger motor vehicles or trucks with a declared gross weight of not more than 11,000 pounds. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles shall administer the program.
Title
Fleet vehicle registration. Establishes the fleet registration program (program) for Indiana residents who own or lease at least 1,000 passenger motor vehicles or trucks with a declared gross weight of not more than 11,000 pounds. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles shall administer the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] |
Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Public Law 12 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 325: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | Representatives Brown, C., Sullivan, Pryor added as cosponsors |
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Representative Soliday added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |