IN SCR0005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing John Schoffstall.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing John Schoffstall.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pfaff |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First reading: adopted standing vote |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/resolutions/senate/concurrent/5/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/4/6/e4460bf3/SC0005.01.INTR.pdf |