IN SCR0050 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating Emily Graves on being named a Prudential Spirit of Community Awards 2020 State Honoree.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating Emily Graves on being named a Prudential Spirit of Community Awards 2020 State Honoree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/senate/concurrent/50/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/2/4/92244f15/SC0050.01.INTR.pdf |