KS HB2043 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2043 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Secretaries for children and families and for aging and disability services; powers, duties and functions.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2043 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Secretaries for children and families and for aging and disability services; powers, duties and functions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015 |
2015-05-12 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Pilcher-Cook, Senator O'Donnell and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2015-03-25 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hawkins , Representative Concannon and Representative Ward as conferees |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 04, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-12 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 27, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546S |
2015-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-01-16 | House | House Introduced |