KS HB2048 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemption for purchase by and on behalf of Jackson county fair association.
Title
Sales tax exemption for purchase by and on behalf of Jackson county fair association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-01-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-01-22 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2048/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2048_00_0000.pdf |