KS HB2061 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an income tax rate of 5% for individuals and corporations, decreasing the surtax for entities subject to the privilege tax and providing that future income tax rate decreases be contingent on exceeding revenue estimates.
Title
Providing an income tax rate of 5% for individuals and corporations, decreasing the surtax for entities subject to the privilege tax and providing that future income tax rate decreases be contingent on exceeding revenue estimates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |