KS HB2162 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 30 May 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 30 May 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of State; ballot language statements.
Title
Secretary of State; ballot language statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 83 Nay: 28 (Y: 83 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 31 Nay: 6 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 31 Nay: 6 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 30 May 2013 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 28, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 83 Nay: 28 |
2013-05-21 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 31 Nay: 6 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Senator Haley replaces Senator Faust-Goudeau on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Senator Smith replaces Senator Holmes on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Senator King replaces Senator Pyle on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | House Representative Pauls replaces Representative Sawyer on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | House Representative Bruchman replaces Representative Huebert on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | House Representative Kinzer replaces Representative Schwab on the Conference Committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Pyle, Senator Holmes and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2013-03-26 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Schwab , Representative Huebert and Representative Sawyer as conferees |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, 27 February 2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-27 | House | House Representative Schwab raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Howell was adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Howell |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-01-30 | House | House Introduced |