KS HB2168 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax exemption and classification for property used for bed and breakfast purposes.
Title
Property tax exemption and classification for property used for bed and breakfast purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 12, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 582N |
2015-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-01-28 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2168/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2168_00_0000.pdf |