KS HB2278 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring audits of safe and secure schools plans for all school districts including staggered on-site inspections.
Title
Requiring audits of safe and secure schools plans for all school districts including staggered on-site inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-02 | House | House Introduced |